Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2935 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16341 Week
» 69357 Month
» 188884 Year
» 3215737 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8064 |
12/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20064 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2970/8222 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
12/06/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
14/09/1990 |
Time in Service |
29 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
09/10/1991 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
12/06/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
10/1975 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8064 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2970 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20064 |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/09/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20064 |
|
|
09/10/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|