Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3440 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16846 Week
» 69862 Month
» 189389 Year
» 3216242 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8067 |
26/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20067 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2973/8225 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
26/06/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
21/01/1987 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys |
Cut Up |
30/06/1988 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
26/06/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/06/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8067 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2973 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20067 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
20/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Wigston (WG) |
|
|
21/01/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20067 |
|
|
30/06/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|