Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 34 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6249 Week
» 17954 Month
» 349443 Year
» 426030 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D807 24/06/1959

Names Carried
Name Date From
CARADOC 24/06/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 24/06/1959
Withdrawn 26/09/1972
Time in Service 13 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys
Total Mileage 1,317,000 miles
Cut Up 03/11/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 24/06/1959
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 31/08/1967
83A Newton Abbot 7w/e 27/07/1968
83A Newton Abbot q/e 22/05/1971
84A Laira 9w/e 08/01/1972
   Withdrawn 26/09/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/06/1959 To Service To service as D807, name: CARADOC
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
27/07/1959 Sightings 1st diesel haulage on up 'Torbay Express' The Early Years of London Diesels  
03/09/1960 Sightings Working the overnight Manchester-Penzance service at Stoneycombe, Devon - train loco - piloted by D6318 Green Diesel Days - Huntriss  
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
22/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
26/09/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D807    
03/11/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev