Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2971 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16377 Week
» 69393 Month
» 188920 Year
» 3215773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8071 |
10/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20071 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2977/8229 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
10/07/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
23/07/1993 |
Time in Service |
32 yrs , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
22/03/1995 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
10/07/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/07/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8071 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2977 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
08/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20071 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
23/07/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20071 |
|
|
22/03/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|