Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 365 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18168 Week
» 71184 Month
» 190711 Year
» 3217564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8082 |
31/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20082 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2988/8240 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
31/08/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
23/07/1993 |
Time in Service |
31 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys |
Cut Up |
23/03/1995 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
31/08/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8082 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2988 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
07/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
02/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
30/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20082 |
|
|
23/07/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20082 |
|
|
23/03/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|