Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3771 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13345 Week
» 78299 Month
» 280963 Year
» 3307816 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8088 |
26/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20088 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
26/09/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
26/09/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/09/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8088 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20088 |
|
|
10/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Toton (TO) |
|
|
22/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|