Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 98 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 15420 Month
» 346909 Year
» 423496 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8096 26/10/1961
TOPS (Tops) 20096 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service 26/10/1961
Withdrawn 01/06/1992
Time in Service 30 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
65A Eastfield (New) 26/10/1961
66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/01/1968
66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/04/1968
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 07/03/1970
66A Polmadie w/e 09/10/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Withdrawn 01/06/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
26/10/1961 To Service To service as D8096
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Eastfield (65A)
   
27/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
27/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
13/07/1969 Sightings Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. RO 10/1969 Link
17/07/1969 Sightings Motherwell depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
07/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20096    
01/06/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 20096    

prev prev