Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 4486 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20098 Week
» 118743 Month
» 321407 Year
» 3348260 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8109 |
29/12/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20109 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
29/12/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/12/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8109 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20109 |
|
|
29/11/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
14/02/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20109 |
|
|
02/04/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|