Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2037 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19840 Week
» 72856 Month
» 192383 Year
» 3219236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8113 |
01/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20113 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
01/02/1962 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/02/1962 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8113 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
15/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20113 |
|
|
13/09/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20113 |
|
|
12/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carlisle Kingmoor (Etterby Road Industrail Estate) |
|
|