Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2263 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20066 Week
» 73082 Month
» 192609 Year
» 3219462 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8122 |
22/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20122 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
22/03/1962 to Polmadie (66A) |
Withdrawn |
05/07/1991 |
Time in Service |
29 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
15/10/1993 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
22/03/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 02/1972 |
|
Cabside tablet recess filled in |
|
|
|
|
02/1972 |
|
Tablet Catcher recesses filled |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/03/1962 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8122 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Polmadie (66A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Cabside tablet recess filled in |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Tablet Catcher recesses filled |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20122 |
|
|
05/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20122 |
|
|
15/10/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|