Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1146 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18949 Week
» 71965 Month
» 191492 Year
» 3218345 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8131 |
26/02/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20131 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) |
20306 |
02/03/1998 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
26/02/1966 to Tinsley (41A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
26/02/1966 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 01/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/02/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/02/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8131 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
31/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20131 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
02/03/1998 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20306 |
|
|