Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 895 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6500 Week
» 18047 Month
» 417729 Year
» 494316 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8137 12/04/1966
TOPS (Tops) 20137 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 12/04/1966
Withdrawn 01/12/1992
Time in Service 26 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D02 (New) 12/04/1966
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/02/1969
ED Eastfield w/e 11/05/1974
   Withdrawn 01/12/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/04/1966 To Service To service as D8137
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
08/02/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20137    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
01/12/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 20137    

prev prev