Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 3818 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17224 Week
» 70240 Month
» 189767 Year
» 3216620 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8138 |
23/04/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20138 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
23/04/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/06/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/04/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
07/06/1971 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8138 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Birmingham Division (D02) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
07/06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20138 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|