Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 135 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 23766 Week
» 88720 Month
» 291384 Year
» 3318237 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8143 |
06/07/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20143 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
06/07/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1972 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/07/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
11/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/07/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8143 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Birmingham Division (D02) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20143 |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
10/01/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20143 |
|
|
23/08/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|