Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1925 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15331 Week
» 68347 Month
» 187874 Year
» 3214727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8149 |
05/07/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20149 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
05/07/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/07/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/07/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8149 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20149 |
|
|
06/03/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/11/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20149 |
|
|
30/09/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|