Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4245 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17651 Week
» 70667 Month
» 190194 Year
» 3217047 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D815 |
20/01/1960 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
DRUID |
20/01/1960 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
437 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
20/01/1960 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
03/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
11 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,087,000 miles |
Cut Up |
13/10/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MFYE |
Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
83D |
|
Laira (New) |
on |
20/01/1960 |
83A |
|
Newton Abbot |
4w/e |
31/08/1967 |
|
|
Stored |
6w/e |
03/10/1971 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/10/1971 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/01/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
17/07/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Mechanical seizures or failures |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D815, name: DRUID Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 815 |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
13/10/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|