Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 498 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5099 Week
» 16646 Month
» 416328 Year
» 492915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D816 17/02/1960

Names Carried
Name Date From
ECLIPSE 17/02/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 17/02/1960
Withdrawn 01/01/1972
Time in Service 11 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys
Total Mileage 1,144,000 miles
Cut Up 22/09/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 17/02/1960
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 31/08/1967
   Withdrawn 01/01/1972

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/02/1960 To Service To service as D816, name: ECLIPSE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
20/07/1960 Sightings Seen at Lostwithiel on a rake of china clay wagons (9B70) - All over green Green Diesel Days - Huntriss  
06/08/1961 Sightings 10:10 Wolverhampton - Penzance at Dainton Bank (1C37) - All over green    
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
22/07/1969 Sightings Newton Abbot Depot visit: On Newton Abbot depot RO 10/1969 Link
29/07/1969 Sightings Torquay - Exeter St. Davids Royal Train (1X01) RO 9/1969  
01/01/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D816    
22/09/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev