Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 466 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18269 Week
» 71285 Month
» 190812 Year
» 3217665 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8172 |
28/10/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20172 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/3 (BR)) |
20305 |
15/04/1986 |
|
TOPS (20/0 (R)) |
20172 |
02/11/1986 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
28/10/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/10/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/10/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8172 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20172 |
|
|
15/04/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20305 |
|
|
02/11/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20172 |
|
|
11/10/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20172 |
|
|
29/03/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|