Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1048 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18851 Week
» 71867 Month
» 191394 Year
» 3218247 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8173 |
08/12/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20173 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/3 (BR)) |
20306 |
15/04/1986 |
|
TOPS (20/0 (R)) |
20173 |
02/11/1986 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
08/12/1966 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1972 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/12/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
12/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/12/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8173 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20173 |
|
|
15/04/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20306 |
|
|
02/11/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20173 |
|
|
04/02/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20173 |
|
|
19/02/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|