Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 277 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4445 Week
» 19559 Month
» 322749 Year
» 1544314 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8175 08/11/1966  
TOPS (Tops) 20175 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 08/11/1966 to Nottingham Division (D16)
Withdrawn 13/09/1991
Time in Service 24 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 31/12/2003
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carlisle Kingmoor (Etterby Road Industrail Estate))
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D16 Nottingham Division (New) on 08/11/1966
   Withdrawn on 13/09/1991


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/11/1966 To Service To service as D8175
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20175    
13/09/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 20175    
31/12/2003 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carlisle Kingmoor (Etterby Road Industrail Estate)    

prev prev