Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 330 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6693 Week
» 9275 Month
» 273908 Year
» 1495473 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8176 16/11/1966  
TOPS (Tops) 20176 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 16/11/1966
Withdrawn 21/10/1991
Time in Service 24 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 18/01/1994
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D16 Nottingham Division (New) 16/11/1966
   Withdrawn 21/10/1991


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/11/1966 To Service To service as D8176
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16)
   
06/02/1972 Sightings Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed RO 4/1972 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20176    
21/10/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 20176    
18/01/1994 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev