Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 170 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17973 Week
» 70989 Month
» 190516 Year
» 3217369 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8198 |
22/04/1967 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20198 |
21/10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
22/04/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/04/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/04/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8198 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
21/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20198 |
|
|
05/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20198 |
|
|
11/10/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|