Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 238 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6022 Week
» 27411 Month
» 146938 Year
» 3173791 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D820 |
04/05/1960 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
GRENVILLE |
04/05/1960 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
437 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
04/05/1960 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
02/11/1972 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
12 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,126,000 miles |
Cut Up |
15/08/1973 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/05/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
30/06/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D820, name: GRENVILLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
31/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
02/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 820 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
15/08/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|