Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 63 Today
» 1154 Yesterday
» 4585 Week
» 25487 Month
» 25487 Year
» 1247052 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82000   04/04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 04/04/1952 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawal Sat 10/12/1966
Scrapping During 04/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 14 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84E Tyseley (New) 04/04/1952
88C Barry 4w/e 08/08/1953
88F Treherbert 4w/e 03/10/1953
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/12/1955
84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 24/01/1959
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 27/02/1960
9H Patricroft w/e 03/04/1965
   Withdrawn 10/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 19/04/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 30/04/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 84K Wrexham Rhosddu m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/04/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 82000
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
10/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 82000    
04/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev