Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1093 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 2319 Week
» 21964 Month
» 56606 Year
» 1278171 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82003   02/05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 02/05/1952 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawal Sat 10/12/1966
Scrapping During 04/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84E Tyseley (New) 02/05/1952
84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/05/1953
88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 22/03/1958
6E Chester West 4w/e 09/08/1958
6A Chester (MR) w/e 09/04/1960
82E Bristol Barrow Road w/e 22/04/1961
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 24/03/1962
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 16/06/1962
9H Patricroft w/e 03/04/1965
   Withdrawn 10/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 17/05/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1952
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/04/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 24/03/1962
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth m/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/05/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 82003
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
10/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 82003    
04/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev