Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 262 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 262 Week
» 34837 Month
» 104316 Year
» 1325881 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82004   14/05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 14/05/1952 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawal Fri 01/10/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Birds (Bridgend)
Service Life 13 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84E Tyseley (New) 14/05/1952
88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 23/04/1955
84H Wellington 4w/e 11/08/1956
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/06/1959
84H Wellington 4w/e 05/09/1959
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 01/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 17/05/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   01/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/05/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 82004
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
01/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82004    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Bridgend    
07/05/1966 Sightings Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped RO 8/1966 Link

prev prev