Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 238 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 238 Week
» 34813 Month
» 104292 Year
» 1325857 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82006   27/05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 27/05/1952 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawal Sun 18/09/1966
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Buttigiegs (Newport)
Service Life 14 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84E Tyseley (New) 27/05/1952
88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 16/07/1955
84H Wellington 4w/e 11/08/1956
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/01/1960
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 25/02/1961
70A Nine Elms w/e 01/05/1965
   Withdrawn 18/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1952
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 25/02/1961
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 10/05/1965
WDN   w/e 18/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/05/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 82006
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
01/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
18/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 82006    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport    

prev prev