Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 435 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1820 Week
» 8625 Month
» 115571 Year
» 1337136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82009   13/06/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 13/06/1952 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawal Sat 05/11/1966
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 14 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84E Tyseley (New) 13/06/1952
88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 23/04/1955
84H Wellington 4w/e 08/09/1956
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/06/1959
84H Wellington 4w/e 05/09/1959
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/01/1960
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 08/10/1960
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 25/02/1961
9H Patricroft w/e 03/04/1965
   Withdrawn 05/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 14/06/1952
NEW 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 25/02/1961
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 05/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/06/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 82009
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
05/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 82009    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev