Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 856 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4404 Week
» 5294 Month
» 313275 Year
» 1197656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82010   25/06/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 25/06/1952 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal Sat 24/04/1965
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Birds (Morriston)
Service Life 12 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) 25/06/1952
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
   Withdrawn 24/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 91S To Southern Region m/e 30/06/1952
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 30/07/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/11/1962
WDN   w/e 25/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/06/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 82010
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
24/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82010    
09/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Morriston    

prev prev