Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 112 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 7296 Month
» 315277 Year
» 1199658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82011   01/07/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 01/07/1952 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal Sun 30/08/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 12 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) 01/07/1952
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
   Withdrawn 30/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 30/07/1952
NEW 91S To Southern Region m/e 31/07/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/11/1962
WDN   w/e 30/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/07/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 82011
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
30/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 82011    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev