Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 975 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5549 Week
» 33507 Month
» 68149 Year
» 1289714 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82013   09/07/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 09/07/1952 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal Sun 14/06/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 11 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) 09/07/1952
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
   Withdrawn 14/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 30/07/1952
NEW 91S To Southern Region m/e 31/07/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/07/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 82013
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
14/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 82013    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev