Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 644 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4160 Week
» 32118 Month
» 66760 Year
» 1288325 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82019   26/09/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 26/09/1952 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Birds (Risca)
Service Life 14 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) 26/09/1952
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
   Withdrawn 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 30/07/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/11/1962
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/09/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 82019
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 82019    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Risca    

prev prev