Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 225 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2564 Week
» 8698 Month
» 236582 Year
» 1458147 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82021 on 06/10/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 398
To Service Sun 06/10/1954 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal Sun 17/10/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Buttigiegs (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) 06/10/1954
2B Nuneaton 4w/e 09/10/1954
6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/01/1960
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 26/03/1960
6H Bangor w/e 20/06/1964
6F Machynlleth w/e 27/06/1964
70A Nine Elms w/e 01/05/1965
   Withdrawn 17/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 06/10/1954
LOAN 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/10/1954
NEW NYA   m/e 31/10/1954
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 6F Machynlleth 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 10/05/1965
WDN   w/e 17/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/05/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. SLS/196107
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/10/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 82021
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F)    
01/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
17/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82021    

prev prev