Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 129 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17932 Week
» 70948 Month
» 190475 Year
» 3217328 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
82023 |
on |
22/10/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/10/1954 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
24/09/1962 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
19/11/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1963 |
Eastligh MPD (Ex Works) |
Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 82023 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
24/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
02/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 82023 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|