Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4497 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20109 Week
» 118754 Month
» 321418 Year
» 3348271 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
82025 |
on |
05/11/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
30/11/1954 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
24/09/1962 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
19/11/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/08/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/11/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 82025 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
24/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
09/08/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 82025 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|