|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Outside Weigh House) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/11/1954 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 82027 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
||
08/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
11/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
22/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
20/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
14/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
06/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) | ||
14/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
09/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 82027 | ||
04/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cox and Danks: Park Royal |