Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19825 Week
» 72841 Month
» 192368 Year
» 3219221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8203 |
24/02/1958 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
ADB968003 |
21/03/1969 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
24/02/1958 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/02/1958 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
26/07/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
28/12/1960 |
28/01/1961 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
32 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
04/12/1961 |
08/02/1962 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
67 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
09/09/1963 |
15/11/1963 |
General |
|
|
|
68 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
31/03/1964 |
01/04/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
|
13/08/1968 |
Casual |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/02/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8203 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
15/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Toton (18A) |
|
|
26/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
04/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
28/12/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/12/1960. Dep: 28/01/1961. |
|
|
11/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
04/12/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/12/1961. Dep: 08/02/1962. |
|
|
17/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/09/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1963. Dep: 15/11/1963. |
|
|
31/03/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1964. Dep: 01/04/1964. |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
13/08/1968 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Casual) - Dep: 13/08/1968. |
|
|
20/03/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8203 |
|
|
21/03/1969 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to ADB968003 |
|
|
10/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Colchester MPD |
|
|