Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 399 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1784 Week
» 8589 Month
» 115535 Year
» 1337100 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82031   30/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 30/12/1954 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal Sat 10/12/1966
Scrapping During 06/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 30/12/1954
83D Laira 4w/e 29/01/1955
83A Newton Abbot 8w/e 26/03/1955
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/05/1955
84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 24/01/1959
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/01/1960
6H Bangor w/e 20/06/1964
9H Patricroft w/e 03/04/1965
   Withdrawn 10/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/12/1954
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 84K Wrexham Rhosddu m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/12/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 82031
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
10/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 82031    
06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev