Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 383 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1768 Week
» 8573 Month
» 115519 Year
» 1337084 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82032   01/01/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 01/01/1955 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal Sat 01/05/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Birds (Morriston)
Service Life 10 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 01/01/1955
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 16/07/1955
88F Treherbert 4w/e 06/10/1956
88A Radyr 4w/e 22/03/1958
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
6E Chester West 4w/e 09/08/1958
6A Chester (MR) w/e 09/04/1960
89A Shrewsbury w/e 15/04/1961
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 12/08/1961
89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 02/12/1961
6H Bangor w/e 27/06/1964
   Withdrawn 01/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 29/01/1955
NEW NYA   m/e 31/01/1955
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/04/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 01/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/01/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 82032
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
15/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
01/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82032    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Morriston    

prev prev