Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 435 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1820 Week
» 8625 Month
» 115571 Year
» 1337136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82035   03/03/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 03/03/1955 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal Fri 06/08/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 03/03/1955
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 28/12/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 6w/e 13/04/1964
83E Yeovil Town 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn 06/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/03/1955
1STALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 31/12/1963
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 30/03/1964
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 3w/e 14/09/1964
TOSTORE   4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   4w/e 08/08/1965
WDN   m/e 31/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/03/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 82035
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
06/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82035    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev