Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 411 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1796 Week
» 8601 Month
» 115547 Year
» 1337112 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82036   01/04/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 01/04/1955 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal Wed 21/07/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 01/04/1955
88A Radyr 4w/e 22/03/1958
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
6E Chester West 4w/e 09/08/1958
6A Chester (MR) w/e 09/04/1960
89C Machynlleth w/e 15/04/1961
89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 02/12/1961
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/07/1962
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
   Withdrawn 21/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
1STALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 23/04/1955
NEW NYA   m/e 30/04/1955
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/04/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
WDN   w/e 25/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/04/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 82036
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
15/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
21/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82036    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev