Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 395 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1780 Week
» 8585 Month
» 115531 Year
» 1337096 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82037   20/04/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 20/04/1955 to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)
Withdrawal Wed 25/08/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (New) 20/04/1955
88C Barry 4w/e 16/07/1955
88E Abercynon m/e 16/06/1956
88C Barry 4w/e 14/07/1956
88A Radyr 4w/e 19/04/1958
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 12/06/1958
84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 24/01/1959
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/01/1960
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
   Withdrawn 25/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
1STALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 23/04/1955
NEW NYA   m/e 30/04/1955
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 84K Wrexham Rhosddu m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
WDN   25/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/04/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 82037
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)
   
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
25/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82037    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev