Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 152 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4967 Week
» 11101 Month
» 238985 Year
» 1460550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82039 on 10/05/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 410
To Service Fri 10/05/1955 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal Fri 02/07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Birds (Long Marston)
Service Life 10 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 10/05/1955
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 24/01/1959
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
83D Exmouth Junction 6w/e 13/04/1964
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 02/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 88C Barry m/e 31/05/1955
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 30/03/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   02/07/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1958 Bristol Bath Road MPD Standard tanks 82035/6/7/9 have moved here from Radyr June. where they have been replaced by GWR4143/52/60/3/4 which have been displaced at Rhymney by diesel railcars. SLS/195807
19/02/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/05/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 82039
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
02/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82039    

prev prev