Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 901 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6506 Week
» 18053 Month
» 417735 Year
» 494322 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8204 17/04/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 17/04/1958
Withdrawn 27/03/1971
Time in Service 12 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1D Devons Road (Bow) (New) 17/04/1958
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 05/12/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/01/1960
32B Ipswich w/e 17/06/1961
30A Stratford w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn 27/03/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/04/1958 To Service To service as D8204
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D)
   
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/03/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D8204    
01/04/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev