Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 300 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 300 Week
» 34875 Month
» 104354 Year
» 1325919 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82041   17/06/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 17/06/1955 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Scrapping During 05/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 17/06/1955
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 12/06/1958
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 21/03/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 88C Barry m/e 30/06/1955
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/06/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 82041
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82041    
07/05/1966 Sightings Cashmore's Scrapyard, Newport: Dumped RO 8/1966 Link

prev prev