Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 255 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 255 Week
» 34830 Month
» 104309 Year
» 1325874 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82043   27/06/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 27/06/1955 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal Fri 28/02/1964
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Locomotive Works (Eastleigh)
Service Life 8 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 27/06/1955
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 12/06/1958
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/10/1960
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
   Withdrawn 28/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1955
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
WDN   07/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/06/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 82043
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
28/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 82043    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh    

prev prev