Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 386 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1771 Week
» 8576 Month
» 115522 Year
» 1337087 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82044   12/08/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 12/08/1955 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal Thu 18/11/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Buttigiegs (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 12/08/1955
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 12/06/1958
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
87H Neyland 4w/e 07/10/1961
83B Taunton 4w/e 04/11/1961
83D Exmouth Junction 7w/e 22/06/1964
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 02/08/1965
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) (Reinstated) 20/09/1965
   Withdrawn 18/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 88C Barry m/e 31/08/1955
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 13/06/1965
REINS 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/08/1965
WDN   4w/e 08/08/1965
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 3w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   18/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/08/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 82044
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
20/09/1965 Reinstated Reinstated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
18/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82044    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport    

prev