Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 69 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17872 Week
» 70888 Month
» 190415 Year
» 3217268 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8206 |
19/05/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
19/05/1958 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/05/1958 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
23/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
18/12/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
04/03/1961 |
25/03/1961 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
22 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
08/03/1963 |
23/03/1963 |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
|
16 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
26/09/1963 |
27/09/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
01/01/1964 |
03/02/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
34 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8206 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
04/03/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/03/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961. |
|
|
11/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
17/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/03/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/03/1963. Dep: 23/03/1963. |
|
|
26/09/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1963. Dep: 27/09/1963. |
|
|
01/01/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/01/1964. Dep: 03/02/1964. |
|
|
04/08/1968 |
To Store |
To Store at Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8206 |
|
|
02/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Woodham Brothers: Barry, South Glamorgan |
|
|