Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1390 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7174 Week
» 28563 Month
» 148090 Year
» 3174943 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8207 |
16/06/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
16/06/1958 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 11/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/06/1958 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8207 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8207 |
|
|
04/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|