Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 908 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6513 Week
» 18060 Month
» 417742 Year
» 494329 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8210 05/11/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 15
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
To Service 05/11/1959
Withdrawn 27/03/1971
Time in Service 11 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 05/11/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 26/11/1960
30A Stratford w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn 27/03/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/11/1959 To Service To service as D8210
Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/03/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D8210    
30/01/1972 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Arrival sidings. RO 4/1972 Link
01/03/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev